|
06/26/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 3603.)
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|