|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6271.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 4585.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 4672.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|