LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1711
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1711
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1711
Action History
05/07/2012
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/23/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/29/2012
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
02/17/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
02/16/2012
Read first time. To print.