California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill March 21, 2012