|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5944.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4445.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5045.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|