|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3209.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2426.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2368.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1726.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on May 27 corrected.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|