|
07/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1534.).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 973.).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on March 30 corrected.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|