LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1732
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1732
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1732
Compare Versions
AB1732 Chaptered July 23, 2012
AB1732 Enrolled July 9, 2012
AB1732 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1732 Amended June 7, 2012
AB1732 Amended April 12, 2012
AB1732 Amended March 20, 2012
AB1732 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1732 Chaptered July 23, 2012
AB1732 Enrolled July 9, 2012
AB1732 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1732 Amended June 7, 2012
AB1732 Amended April 12, 2012
AB1732 Amended March 20, 2012
AB1732 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare