|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 20. Page 4874.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4875.)
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 3. Page 4556.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|