|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4225.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4889.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|