05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/26/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17). | |||
04/10/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | |||
02/21/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/17/2012 | Read first time. To print. |