06/19/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5114.) | |||
05/29/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/27/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/21/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
03/20/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/21/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/17/2012 | Read first time. To print. |