LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1742
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1742
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1742
Action History
04/24/2012
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
03/27/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/20/2012
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
03/19/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
03/01/2012
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
02/21/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
02/17/2012
Read first time. To print.