|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4820.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|