LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1747
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1747
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1747
Compare Versions
AB1747 Chaptered September 14, 2012
AB1747 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB1747 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1747 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1747 Amended June 7, 2012
AB1747 Amended May 9, 2012
AB1747 Amended April 26, 2012
AB1747 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1747 Chaptered September 14, 2012
AB1747 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB1747 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1747 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1747 Amended June 7, 2012
AB1747 Amended May 9, 2012
AB1747 Amended April 26, 2012
AB1747 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare