07/10/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/10/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/29/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
06/25/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/25/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4058.). | |||
06/20/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
06/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/12/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/12/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4336.) | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/21/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/17/2012 | Read first time. To print. |