|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6582.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4906.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4707.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|