|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 637, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6540.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4901.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4816.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|