|
07/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 58, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:55 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Measure version as enrolled on June 20 corrected.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 10. Page 1997.).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1444.).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 2. Page 975.)
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|