|
08/27/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5841.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4376.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5115.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|