LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1768
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1768
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1768
Action History
04/24/2012
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
04/12/2012
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
03/01/2012
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
02/21/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
02/17/2012
Read first time. To print.