|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2377.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1848.).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 701.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|