|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4574.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 4661.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|