05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/02/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/11/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/21/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/17/2012 | Read first time. To print. |