|
07/10/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4058.).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4366.)
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|