|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 5175.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 5197.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 31. Noes 29. Page 4831.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Williams.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|