08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/05/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5047.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/02/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Read first time. To print. |