LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1781
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1781
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1781
Action History
05/25/2012
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/25/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
04/12/2012
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
03/01/2012
Referred to Com. on ED.
02/22/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
02/21/2012
Read first time. To print.