|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4464.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4984.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|