05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/23/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/22/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/21/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
04/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Read first time. To print. |