|
09/27/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6692.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5007.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Huff.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4483.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|