05/16/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/30/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 24). | |||
04/17/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Read first time. To print. |