|
06/28/2012
|
Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 34. Page 5070.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4872.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|