08/30/2012 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |||
06/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/25/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/25/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |||
05/24/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/23/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 14). | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
04/12/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/12/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 4335.) | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 26). | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |