California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill May 7, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill March 21, 2012