LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1839
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1839
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1839
Compare Versions
AB1839 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB1839 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1839 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1839 Amended June 26, 2012
AB1839 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1839 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB1839 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1839 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1839 Amended June 26, 2012
AB1839 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare