|
06/20/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 28, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1305.).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 10. Page 979.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Measure version as introduced on January 25 corrected.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|