California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1842 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill May 10, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012