|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6542.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 4886.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4578.). Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4578.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4779.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|