|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6412.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4748.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4665.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|