05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/18/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/11/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/10/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 28). | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |