05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/27/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/26/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |