|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 5947.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4480.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 4770.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|