LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1874
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1874
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1874
Action History
05/01/2012
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
04/30/2012
Read second time and amended.
04/26/2012
From committee: Be amended, and that the bill, as amended, be returned to the Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S., and the subject matter be re-referred to the Com. on RULES for study. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26).
03/08/2012
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
02/23/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
02/22/2012
Read first time. To print.