|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6574.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4872.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5176.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5194.)
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5138.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gatto.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gatto.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|