06/06/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/08/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
05/01/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/25/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/24/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/05/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |