|
09/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2378.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1863.).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 982.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|