09/29/2012 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |||
09/29/2012 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
08/23/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
08/20/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/20/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4570.). | |||
06/27/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 25). | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 4769.) | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 2). | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |