LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB189
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB189
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB189
Compare Versions
AB189 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB189 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB189 Amended August 30, 2011
AB189 Amended May 27, 2011
AB189 Amended April 7, 2011
AB189 Amended March 3, 2011
AB189 Introduced January 26, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB189 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB189 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB189 Amended August 30, 2011
AB189 Amended May 27, 2011
AB189 Amended April 7, 2011
AB189 Amended March 3, 2011
AB189 Introduced January 26, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare