06/25/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4789.) | |||
05/08/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/03/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Read first time. To print. |